THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:32:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: G1-2300 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 828-0653
Fax: (905) 828-0765
Address: Suite 218
480 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2X6
Phone: (905) 878-8831
Fax: (905) 878-8832
Address: 229 Broadway
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1K4
Phone: 833-904-4591
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Nov 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mundi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mundi (CPSO#: 99626 )
Business Address: 1849 Yonge Street
Suite 218
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 926-1593
Business Address: G1 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 766-9466
Business Address: 218 - 480 Bronte Street South
Halton Hills Ontario L9T 9A9
(905) 878-8831
Business Address: 1 - 40 Shellington Place
Brantford Ontario N3S 0C5
(519) 753-9581

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: G1-2300 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 828-0653
Fax: (905) 828-0765
Address: Suite 218
480 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2X6
Phone: (905) 878-8831
Fax: (905) 878-8832
Address: 229 Broadway
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1K4
Phone: 833-904-4591
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Nov 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mundi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mundi (CPSO#: 99626 )
Business Address: 1849 Yonge Street
Suite 218
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 926-1593
Business Address: G1 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 766-9466
Business Address: 218 - 480 Bronte Street South
Halton Hills Ontario L9T 9A9
(905) 878-8831
Business Address: 1 - 40 Shellington Place
Brantford Ontario N3S 0C5
(519) 753-9581

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Apr 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 17 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Amandeep Singh Mundi may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine and cardiology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Amandeep Singh Mundi may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine and cardiology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Apr 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2012