THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:54:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Hôpital Montfort
Urgence
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 616-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1K0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 45 Montreal Rd
Vanier ON K1L 6E8
Phone: 613-763-6882
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Britt-Cote Médecine Société Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Britt-Cote (CPSO#: 99630 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Montfort Hospital
Emergency Department
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
613-746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Hôpital Montfort
Urgence
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 616-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1K0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 45 Montreal Rd
Vanier ON K1L 6E8
Phone: 613-763-6882
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Britt-Cote Médecine Société Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Britt-Cote (CPSO#: 99630 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Montfort Hospital
Emergency Department
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
613-746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAXIME SIMON ROY BRITT-COTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRITT-COTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAXIME SIMON ROY BRITT-COTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRITT-COTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2012
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2012