THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:04:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 20 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Mireau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mireau (CPSO#: 99635 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E5J1
7059295870

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 20 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Mireau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mireau (CPSO#: 99635 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E5J1
7059295870

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT MIREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIREAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT MIREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIREAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2012
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2012