THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:20:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 645-2444
Extension: 3
Fax: (519) 645-2545
Address: 1051 wonderland road south
London Ontario N6K3X4
Phone: 519-645-2444
Extension: 5
Fax: 519-645-2545
Address: 641 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6C 2T9
Phone: 519-686-8585
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rai (CPSO#: 99641 )
Business Address: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 5A9
(519) 645-2444 Extn: 3

Corporation Name: A. Rai & S. Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 645-2444
Extension: 3
Fax: (519) 645-2545
Address: 1051 wonderland road south
London Ontario N6K3X4
Phone: 519-645-2444
Extension: 5
Fax: 519-645-2545
Address: 641 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6C 2T9
Phone: 519-686-8585
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rai (CPSO#: 99641 )
Business Address: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 5A9
(519) 645-2444 Extn: 3

Corporation Name: A. Rai & S. Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Apr 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 17 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Amendeep Singh Rai may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Amendeep Singh Rai may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Apr 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2012