THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:38:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1755 Brimley Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1P 0A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-290-0361
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sureka Paramaguru Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Paramaguru (CPSO#: 99643 )
Business Address: One Care Medical Clinic
1755 Brimley Road
Scarborough Ontario M1P 0A3
(416) 290-0361

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1755 Brimley Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1P 0A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-290-0361
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sureka Paramaguru Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Paramaguru (CPSO#: 99643 )
Business Address: One Care Medical Clinic
1755 Brimley Road
Scarborough Ontario M1P 0A3
(416) 290-0361

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUREKA PARAMAGURU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARAMAGURU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUREKA PARAMAGURU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARAMAGURU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2012