THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:10:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Endocrinology Centres
Suite 2B
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 4E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-1035
Fax: (416) 645-1036
Address: 2979 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C6
Phone: 905-595-0560
Fax: 905-595-0562

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 29 Nov 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadeem Aslam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Aslam (CPSO#: 99654 )
Business Address: 2979 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C6
(905) 595-0560
Business Address: LMC Endocrinology Centres
2B - 1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 4E1
(416) 645-0135

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Endocrinology Centres
Suite 2B
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 4E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-1035
Fax: (416) 645-1036
Address: 2979 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C6
Phone: 905-595-0560
Fax: 905-595-0562

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 29 Nov 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadeem Aslam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Aslam (CPSO#: 99654 )
Business Address: 2979 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C6
(905) 595-0560
Business Address: LMC Endocrinology Centres
2B - 1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 4E1
(416) 645-0135

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
31 Jul 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 31 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nadeem Aslam may practise medicine independently in Endocrinology and
Metabolism, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nadeem Aslam may practise medicine independently in Endocrinology and
Metabolism, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2012