THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrien Selim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Selim (CPSO#: 99659 )
Business Address: 21 Maamuu Road
Chisasibi Quebec J0M 1E0
(819) 855-9001
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrien Selim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Selim (CPSO#: 99659 )
Business Address: 21 Maamuu Road
Chisasibi Quebec J0M 1E0
(819) 855-9001
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIEN SELIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIEN SELIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2012
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2012