THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:43:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. OK Medical Center
1278 The Queensway
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 1S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 848-9795
Fax: (416) 521-7216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Mar 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 24 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Oczachowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Oczachowski (CPSO#: 99669 )
Business Address: Dr. OK Medical Centre
1278 The Queensway
Suite 4
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 1S3
(416) 848-9795

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. OK Medical Center
1278 The Queensway
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 1S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 848-9795
Fax: (416) 521-7216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Mar 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 24 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Oczachowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Oczachowski (CPSO#: 99669 )
Business Address: Dr. OK Medical Centre
1278 The Queensway
Suite 4
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 1S3
(416) 848-9795

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Jun 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 19 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Caroline Oczachowski may practise mediine independently in family medicine,
only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Caroline Oczachowski may practise mediine independently in family medicine,
only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 May 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 May 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2012