THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:36:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: Pankratieva, Elena (Used Until: 02 Jun 2021)
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 680 1065
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elena Pankratieva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Maric (CPSO#: 99671 )
Business Address: 201-770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
6136801065

General Information

Former Name: Pankratieva, Elena (Used Until: 02 Jun 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 680 1065
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elena Pankratieva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Maric (CPSO#: 99671 )
Business Address: 201-770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
6136801065

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Sep 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 12 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Elena Pankratieva may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Elena Pankratieva may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2012