THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:02:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4646 Dufferin Street
Unit 9
Toronto Ontario M3H 5S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 512-6407
Fax: (416) 512-6375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fernando Gonzalez Martinez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gonzalez Martinez (CPSO#: 99677 )
Business Address: 8760 Jane Street
Suite B05B
Concord Ontario L4K 0E8
(905) 237-4623

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4646 Dufferin Street
Unit 9
Toronto Ontario M3H 5S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 512-6407
Fax: (416) 512-6375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fernando Gonzalez Martinez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gonzalez Martinez (CPSO#: 99677 )
Business Address: 8760 Jane Street
Suite B05B
Concord Ontario L4K 0E8
(905) 237-4623

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Aug 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 18 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Fernando Gonzalez Martinez may practise independently in physical medicine
and rehabilitation, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Fernando Gonzalez Martinez may practise independently in physical medicine
and rehabilitation, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2012
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2012