THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:49:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Karaganda State Medical Academy, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingsbridge Medical Centre
Suite 111
33 City Centre Dr
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 507-1111
Fax: (905) 890-7102
Address: 279 Queen St S
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1L9
Phone: 2898489100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tatyana Selyanina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Selyanina (CPSO#: 99682 )
Business Address: 956 Fredonia Dr
Mississauga ON L5C 2W4
6479603106
Business Address: 111-33 City Centre Dr
Mississauga ON L5B 2N5

Corporation Name: Dr. Tatyana Selyanina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Karaganda State Medical Academy, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingsbridge Medical Centre
Suite 111
33 City Centre Dr
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 507-1111
Fax: (905) 890-7102
Address: 279 Queen St S
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1L9
Phone: 2898489100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tatyana Selyanina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Selyanina (CPSO#: 99682 )
Business Address: 956 Fredonia Dr
Mississauga ON L5C 2W4
6479603106
Business Address: 111-33 City Centre Dr
Mississauga ON L5B 2N5

Corporation Name: Dr. Tatyana Selyanina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TATYANA SELYANINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELYANINA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TATYANA SELYANINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELYANINA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Karaganda State Medical Academy, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2012
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2012