THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Garrison Village Drive
Medical Office
Niagara-on-the-Lake Ontario L0S 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054689189
Fax: 905 4684947

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Samreen Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Malik (CPSO#: 99684 )
Business Address: 101 Garrison Village Dr
Niagara on the Lake ON L0S 1J9

Corporation Name: Dr. Saif Ullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2017

Corporation Name: Dr.Samreen Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Garrison Village Drive
Medical Office
Niagara-on-the-Lake Ontario L0S 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054689189
Fax: 905 4684947

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Samreen Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Malik (CPSO#: 99684 )
Business Address: 101 Garrison Village Dr
Niagara on the Lake ON L0S 1J9

Corporation Name: Dr. Saif Ullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2017

Corporation Name: Dr.Samreen Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMREEN SARWAR MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMREEN SARWAR MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2012