THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 480 Huronia Road, Suite 204
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-503-5800
Fax: 705-503-5801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alex Jahangirvand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jahangirvand (CPSO#: 99691 )
Business Address: 204 - 480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
(705) 503-5800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 480 Huronia Road, Suite 204
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-503-5800
Fax: 705-503-5801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alex Jahangirvand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jahangirvand (CPSO#: 99691 )
Business Address: 204 - 480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
(705) 503-5800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEX JAHANGIRVAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAHANGIRVAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEX JAHANGIRVAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAHANGIRVAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2013