THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:12:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053882511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: 7057432121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Akinade Adebowale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adebowale (CPSO#: 99704 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
100
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2

Corporation Name: Dr. Akinade Adebowale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053882511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: 7057432121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Akinade Adebowale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adebowale (CPSO#: 99704 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
100
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2

Corporation Name: Dr. Akinade Adebowale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKINADE OLUSEYI ADEBOWALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEBOWALE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKINADE OLUSEYI ADEBOWALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEBOWALE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2012