THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:15:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8528
Extension: 71278
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALIREZA KHATAMI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khatami (CPSO#: 99707 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 613-798-5555 Extn: 71278
Business Address: 159 Roger Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 5C7
613-798-5555 Extn: 71278

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8528
Extension: 71278
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALIREZA KHATAMI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khatami (CPSO#: 99707 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 613-798-5555 Extn: 71278
Business Address: 159 Roger Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 5C7
613-798-5555 Extn: 71278

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Sep 2023
31 Aug 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 31 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ALIREZA KHATAMI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Nuclear Medicine, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. KHATAMI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. KHATAMI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KHATAMI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KHATAMI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 September, 2023, and expires on 31 August, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. KHATAMI's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ALIREZA KHATAMI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Nuclear Medicine, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. KHATAMI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. KHATAMI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KHATAMI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KHATAMI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 September, 2023, and expires on 31 August, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. KHATAMI's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Aug 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2013