THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:33:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9135 Keele Street
Unit A5
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 663 3937
Fax: 416 663 3731
Address: 2855 Markham Rd
Suite 408
Scarborough Ontario M1X 0C3
Phone: 416 663 3937
Fax: 416 663 3731

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tong (CPSO#: 99734 )
Business Address: Clarity Eye Institute
Suite A5
9135 Keele Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
(416) 663-3937

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9135 Keele Street
Unit A5
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 663 3937
Fax: 416 663 3731
Address: 2855 Markham Rd
Suite 408
Scarborough Ontario M1X 0C3
Phone: 416 663 3937
Fax: 416 663 3731

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tong (CPSO#: 99734 )
Business Address: Clarity Eye Institute
Suite A5
9135 Keele Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
(416) 663-3937

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Dec 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 24 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Melissa Gar-Yun Tong may practice medicine independently in
ophthalmology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Melissa Gar-Yun Tong may practice medicine independently in
ophthalmology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2012