THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 08:13:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Vanderbilt University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 802-600 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON M4X 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 957-7688
Fax: (647) 957-7685
Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health
Plastic Surgery
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 6479577688
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 27 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chadwick Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wu (CPSO#: 99744 )
Business Address: 802-600 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON M4X 1W4
6479577688

Corporation Name: HONG AND WU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Nov 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Vanderbilt University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 802-600 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON M4X 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 957-7688
Fax: (647) 957-7685
Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health
Plastic Surgery
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 6479577688
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 27 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chadwick Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wu (CPSO#: 99744 )
Business Address: 802-600 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON M4X 1W4
6479577688

Corporation Name: HONG AND WU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Nov 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHADWICK WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHADWICK WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Vanderbilt University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 May 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 May 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2013