THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:51:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Joe Brant Hospital ER
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-632-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 169 Main St E
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital ER
Grimsby ON L3M 1P3
Phone: 905-945-2253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dean Hansenberger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hansenberger (CPSO#: 99751 )
Business Address: Joe Brant Hospital
ER
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B0
(905) 563-5315
Business Address: Quest Community Health Centre
Suite 100
145 Queenston Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 2Z9
(905) 688-2558
Business Address: 169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Joe Brant Hospital ER
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-632-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 169 Main St E
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital ER
Grimsby ON L3M 1P3
Phone: 905-945-2253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dean Hansenberger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hansenberger (CPSO#: 99751 )
Business Address: Joe Brant Hospital
ER
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B0
(905) 563-5315
Business Address: Quest Community Health Centre
Suite 100
145 Queenston Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 2Z9
(905) 688-2558
Business Address: 169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEAN TYLER HANSENBERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANSENBERGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEAN TYLER HANSENBERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANSENBERGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2013