THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:58:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 - 5985 Rodeo Drive
Britlin Medical Clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 501-1960
Fax: (905) 501-1965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghazanfar Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Siddiqui (CPSO#: 99774 )
Business Address: 5985 Rodeo Dr
Unit 5
Britlin Medical Clinic
Mississauga ON L5R 3X8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 - 5985 Rodeo Drive
Britlin Medical Clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 501-1960
Fax: (905) 501-1965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghazanfar Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Siddiqui (CPSO#: 99774 )
Business Address: 5985 Rodeo Dr
Unit 5
Britlin Medical Clinic
Mississauga ON L5R 3X8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GHAZANFAR SAMAD SIDDIQUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GHAZANFAR SAMAD SIDDIQUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2013