THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:33:12 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jul 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kenawy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kenawy (CPSO#: 99814 )
Business Address: Vaughan Pediatric Clinic
Unit 310
8333 Weston Road
Vaughan Ontario L4L 8E2
(905) 850-3250
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jul 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kenawy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kenawy (CPSO#: 99814 )
Business Address: Vaughan Pediatric Clinic
Unit 310
8333 Weston Road
Vaughan Ontario L4L 8E2
(905) 850-3250
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Nov 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 25 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sally Kenawy may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sally Kenawy may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Feb 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2013