THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:30:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Uni Federal De Mato Grosso Do Sul, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J Alberto Neder Serafini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Neder Serafini (CPSO#: 99818 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 6G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: 340 Union Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5A2
(613) 544-5220
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Uni Federal De Mato Grosso Do Sul, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J Alberto Neder Serafini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Neder Serafini (CPSO#: 99818 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 6G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: 340 Union Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5A2
(613) 544-5220
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 May 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 16 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JOSE ALBERTO NEDER SERAFINI may practise medicine independently in respirology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JOSE ALBERTO NEDER SERAFINI may practise medicine independently in respirology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Uni Federal De Mato Grosso Do Sul, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 May 2024
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 May 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2013