THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:38:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stittsville Medical Centre
1339 Stittsville Main Street
Stittsville Ontario K2S 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138365083
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 225 Richmond Street W
Maple Telemedicine
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M5V 1W2
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: 1 (888) 745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Apr 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.S. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Chan (CPSO#: 99821 )
Business Address: Stittsville Medical Centre
1339 Stittsville Main Street
Stittsville Ontario K2S 1C6
(613) 836-5083

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stittsville Medical Centre
1339 Stittsville Main Street
Stittsville Ontario K2S 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138365083
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 225 Richmond Street W
Maple Telemedicine
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M5V 1W2
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: 1 (888) 745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Apr 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.S. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Chan (CPSO#: 99821 )
Business Address: Stittsville Medical Centre
1339 Stittsville Main Street
Stittsville Ontario K2S 1C6
(613) 836-5083

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAI SUN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAI SUN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2013