THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:23:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Surgery
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: 416 712 4747
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jul 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony De Buck Van Overstraeten Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. De Buck Van Overstraeten (CPSO#: 99830 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Surgery
Room 455
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 2051

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DUTCH
Medical School: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Surgery
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: 416 712 4747
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jul 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony De Buck Van Overstraeten Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. De Buck Van Overstraeten (CPSO#: 99830 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Surgery
Room 455
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 2051

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Jun 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 18 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANTHONY JEAN PIERRE GHISLAIN C M DE BUCK VAN OVERSTRAETEN may practise medicine independently in general surgery.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANTHONY JEAN PIERRE GHISLAIN C M DE BUCK VAN OVERSTRAETEN may practise medicine independently in general surgery.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2013