THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kathmandu University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough Ontario M1V 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 502-3787
Fax: (416) 502-3789
Address: 1900 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple Ontario L6A 4R9
Phone: 905-832-9112
Fax: 905-832-3455

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Earampamoorthy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Earampamoorthy (CPSO#: 99838 )
Business Address: 1900 Major Mackenzie Drive West
York Ontario L6A 4R9
(905) 832-9112
Business Address: Maxum Professional Centre
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Suite 208
Toronto Ontario M1V 0E3
(416) 502-3787

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Kathmandu University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough Ontario M1V 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 502-3787
Fax: (416) 502-3789
Address: 1900 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple Ontario L6A 4R9
Phone: 905-832-9112
Fax: 905-832-3455

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Earampamoorthy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Earampamoorthy (CPSO#: 99838 )
Business Address: 1900 Major Mackenzie Drive West
York Ontario L6A 4R9
(905) 832-9112
Business Address: Maxum Professional Centre
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Suite 208
Toronto Ontario M1V 0E3
(416) 502-3787

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BABURAM EARAMPAMOORTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EARAMPAMOORTHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BABURAM EARAMPAMOORTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EARAMPAMOORTHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kathmandu University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2013