THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:38:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GUJARATI, KACHCHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bldg A, Suite 201
9100 Jane Street
Mackenzie Heart Centre
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-832-9311
Fax: 1-888-402-2389
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 362-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4P9
Phone: 9058831212
Extension: 6385
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill Hospital
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-2025
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Merali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Merali (CPSO#: 99867 )
Business Address: 9100 Jane St
Mackenzie Heart Centre
Bldg A, Suite 201
Concord ON L4K 0A4
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 214-955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 832-9311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GUJARATI, KACHCHI
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bldg A, Suite 201
9100 Jane Street
Mackenzie Heart Centre
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-832-9311
Fax: 1-888-402-2389
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 362-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4P9
Phone: 9058831212
Extension: 6385
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill Hospital
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-2025
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Merali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Merali (CPSO#: 99867 )
Business Address: 9100 Jane St
Mackenzie Heart Centre
Bldg A, Suite 201
Concord ON L4K 0A4
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 214-955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 832-9311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI-REZA MUHAMMAD MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI-REZA MUHAMMAD MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Apr 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2013