THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:25:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mansoura University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jane Park Doctor's Office
877 Jane Street
York Ontario M6N 4C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-766-4444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 320 Yonge Street
South Barrie Clinic
Barrie Ontario L4N 4C8
Phone: 705-722-3013
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 43 Colborne Street West
City Clinic
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Y5
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Corners Clinic
5113 Sheppard Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4N3
Phone: (647) 349-9393
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Milner Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1S 3P6
Phone: 4162987656
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Magdy L Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 99879 )
Business Address: 701 Sheppard East
Toronto Ontario M5A 2Z3
Business Address: Georgina Health Centre Inc
716 The Queensway South
Keswick Ontario L4P 4C9
Business Address: 1 Oak Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 0A1
Business Address: 877 Jane St
York ON M6N 4C4
4167664444

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Mansoura University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jane Park Doctor's Office
877 Jane Street
York Ontario M6N 4C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-766-4444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 320 Yonge Street
South Barrie Clinic
Barrie Ontario L4N 4C8
Phone: 705-722-3013
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 43 Colborne Street West
City Clinic
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Y5
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Corners Clinic
5113 Sheppard Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4N3
Phone: (647) 349-9393
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Milner Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1S 3P6
Phone: 4162987656
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Magdy L Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 99879 )
Business Address: 701 Sheppard East
Toronto Ontario M5A 2Z3
Business Address: Georgina Health Centre Inc
716 The Queensway South
Keswick Ontario L4P 4C9
Business Address: 1 Oak Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 0A1
Business Address: 877 Jane St
York ON M6N 4C4
4167664444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAGDY LOTFALLA AWADALLA IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAGDY LOTFALLA AWADALLA IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mansoura University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2013