THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:03:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CPM Ottawa
1770 Woodward Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-755-2095
Fax: 613-731-6201

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Francois Constant Medecine Societe Professionelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Constant (CPSO#: 99894 )
Business Address: 1770 Woodward Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3J2
(613) 755-2095

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CPM Ottawa
1770 Woodward Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-755-2095
Fax: 613-731-6201

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Francois Constant Medecine Societe Professionelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Constant (CPSO#: 99894 )
Business Address: 1770 Woodward Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3J2
(613) 755-2095

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCOIS CONSTANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONSTANT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCOIS CONSTANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONSTANT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2013