THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:32:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton St
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 345-3355
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 820 Red River Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 1K2
Phone: 8076834415
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Phone: 416-297-8362
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Nov 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Iran

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Atoosheh Rohani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rohani (CPSO#: 99898 )
Business Address: Curans Heart Center
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5N3
(807) 345-3355
Business Address: 6175 Highway 7
Units 19-20
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
416-297-8362

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton St
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 345-3355
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 820 Red River Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 1K2
Phone: 8076834415
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Phone: 416-297-8362
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Nov 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Iran

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Atoosheh Rohani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rohani (CPSO#: 99898 )
Business Address: Curans Heart Center
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5N3
(807) 345-3355
Business Address: 6175 Highway 7
Units 19-20
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
416-297-8362

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Sep 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 07 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ATOOSHEH ROHANI may practise medicine independently in cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ATOOSHEH ROHANI may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Nov 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2013