THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:30:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingsbridge Medical Centre
Suite 111
33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 507-1111
Fax: (905) 890-7102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Feb 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 27 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Austria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingsbridge Medical Centre
Suite 111
33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 507-1111
Fax: (905) 890-7102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Feb 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 27 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Austria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2017

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
31 Jul 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 31 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Katrina Isabel Endaya Austria may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Katrina Isabel Endaya Austria may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2013