THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:39:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Federal University of Parana, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 928 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-812-1019
Extension: 3
Fax: 905-681-1331
Address: 1200 Main Street West - Room 4Y17
Boris Adult Ambulatory Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-5051
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 18 Jun 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosilene Lanzini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lanzini (CPSO#: 99937 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Federal University of Parana, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 928 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-812-1019
Extension: 3
Fax: 905-681-1331
Address: 1200 Main Street West - Room 4Y17
Boris Adult Ambulatory Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-5051
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 18 Jun 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosilene Lanzini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lanzini (CPSO#: 99937 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Jun 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 18 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rosilene Canzi Almada Lanzini may practise medicine independently in
dermatology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rosilene Canzi Almada Lanzini may practise medicine independently in
dermatology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Federal University of Parana, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2013