THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:39:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-952-3112
Fax: 289-319-0415
Address: 4903 Thomas Alton Blvd
Unit 208
Burlington ON L7M 0W8
Phone: 2894270478
Fax: 9056351860
Address: 350 Eramosa Road
Unit 1
Guelph Ontario N1E 2M9
Phone: (226) 807-6600
Fax: 226.770.5338
Address: 17730 Leslie Street
Suite 106
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4W4
Phone: 9059523112
Fax: 2893190415
Address: 206-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Phone: 519-741-5252
Fax: 519-741-5772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AHMED AL-RIYAMI MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Riyami (CPSO#: 99948 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
905-952-3112

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-952-3112
Fax: 289-319-0415
Address: 4903 Thomas Alton Blvd
Unit 208
Burlington ON L7M 0W8
Phone: 2894270478
Fax: 9056351860
Address: 350 Eramosa Road
Unit 1
Guelph Ontario N1E 2M9
Phone: (226) 807-6600
Fax: 226.770.5338
Address: 17730 Leslie Street
Suite 106
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4W4
Phone: 9059523112
Fax: 2893190415
Address: 206-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Phone: 519-741-5252
Fax: 519-741-5772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AHMED AL-RIYAMI MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Riyami (CPSO#: 99948 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
905-952-3112

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED MOHAMED SALIM AL-RIYAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-RIYAMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED MOHAMED SALIM AL-RIYAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-RIYAMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2013