THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:27:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amlan Das Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Das (CPSO#: 99955 )
Business Address: 90 Resolution Drive
Unit 2
Brampton Ontario L6W 0A7
(416) 883-3877
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
9054942120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amlan Das Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Das (CPSO#: 99955 )
Business Address: 90 Resolution Drive
Unit 2
Brampton Ontario L6W 0A7
(416) 883-3877
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
9054942120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMLAN KUSUM DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMLAN KUSUM DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calcutta, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2013