THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:10:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: IPSITA GOSWAMI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Roy Goswami (CPSO#: 99968 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
905-521-2100 Extn: 72934

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: IPSITA GOSWAMI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Roy Goswami (CPSO#: 99968 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
905-521-2100 Extn: 72934

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Mar 2023
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 15 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Ipsita Roy Goswami may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, McMaster University, in which
Dr. Roy Goswami holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Roy Goswami no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Roy Goswami's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Roy Goswami's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2020, and expires on June 30, 2026.
Upon renewal of Dr. Roy Goswami's academic appointment at McMaster
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Ipsita Roy Goswami may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, McMaster University, in which
Dr. Roy Goswami holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Roy Goswami no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Roy Goswami's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Roy Goswami's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2020, and expires on June 30, 2026.
Upon renewal of Dr. Roy Goswami's academic appointment at McMaster
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calcutta, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2013