THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:34:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown Hospital
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Mar 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bhella (CPSO#: 99978 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
905-845-2571
Business Address: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330
Business Address: Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown Hospital
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Mar 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bhella (CPSO#: 99978 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
905-845-2571
Business Address: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330
Business Address: Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Oct 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 16 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Harvinder Singh Bhella may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Harvinder Singh Bhella may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2013