THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:56:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, TELUGU, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 EGLINTON AVENUE WEST
Mississauga Ontario L5M2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058132200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 2
90 RESOLUTION DRIVE
Brampton Ontario L6W 0A7
Phone: (855) 8547325
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 11 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Sayeed Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ahmed (CPSO#: 99979 )
Business Address: 2-90 Resolution Drive
Brampton Ontario L6W 0A7
(416) 883-3877
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2398

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, TELUGU, URDU
Medical School: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 EGLINTON AVENUE WEST
Mississauga Ontario L5M2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058132200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 2
90 RESOLUTION DRIVE
Brampton Ontario L6W 0A7
Phone: (855) 8547325
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 11 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Sayeed Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ahmed (CPSO#: 99979 )
Business Address: 2-90 Resolution Drive
Brampton Ontario L6W 0A7
(416) 883-3877
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2398

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Sep 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 30 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mohammed Sayeed Ahmed may practise medicine independently in psychiatry,
only.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mohammed Sayeed Ahmed may practise medicine independently in psychiatry,
only.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Mar 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2013