THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:03:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, BENGALI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B-25 Great Lakes Dr
Brampton ON L6R 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-0302
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Arfeen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arfeen (CPSO#: 99996 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, BENGALI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B-25 Great Lakes Dr
Brampton ON L6R 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-0302
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Arfeen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arfeen (CPSO#: 99996 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYED NAJMUL ARFEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARFEEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYED NAJMUL ARFEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARFEEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2013