THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:27:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
Room C2455 Box 900
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Extension: 70179
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DOMINICK BOSSE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bosse (CPSO#: 99998 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
Room C2455 Box 900
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Extension: 70179
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DOMINICK BOSSE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bosse (CPSO#: 99998 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINICK JOSEPH BOSSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINICK JOSEPH BOSSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2013