THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:46:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-0107
Fax: (519) 742-4657
Address: Health Services
University of Waterloo
200 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L3G1
Phone: (519) 888-4096
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 May 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Martins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Martins (CPSO#: 102218 ) Dr. C. Loureiro (CPSO#: 100179 )
Business Address: 430 The Boardwalk
Suite 208
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 742-0107

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-0107
Fax: (519) 742-4657
Address: Health Services
University of Waterloo
200 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L3G1
Phone: (519) 888-4096
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 May 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Martins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Martins (CPSO#: 102218 ) Dr. C. Loureiro (CPSO#: 100179 )
Business Address: 430 The Boardwalk
Suite 208
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 742-0107

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLA LOUREIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUREIRO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLA LOUREIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUREIRO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013