THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 08:37:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk
Suite 208
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-0107
Fax: (519) 742-4657

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Martins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Martins (CPSO#: 102218 ) Dr. C. Loureiro (CPSO#: 100179 )
Business Address: 430 The Boardwalk
Suite 208
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 742-0107

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk
Suite 208
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-0107
Fax: (519) 742-4657

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Martins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Martins (CPSO#: 102218 ) Dr. C. Loureiro (CPSO#: 100179 )
Business Address: 430 The Boardwalk
Suite 208
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 742-0107

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD MANUEL PAIVA MARTINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD MANUEL PAIVA MARTINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013