THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:40:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital, UHN
Gastroenterology
13MP
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5949
Fax: 416-603-5326
Address: 700-790 Bay St
Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 601-340 College Street
Kensington Screening Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-9511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Immune and Digestive Health Institute (TIDHI)
East Tower Entrance, Suite 360
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B4
Phone: (647) 812-2113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 04 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Aug 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 05 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JEYALINGAM JACKSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Jeyalingam (CPSO#: 100402 ) Dr. R. Jackson (CPSO#: 115521 )
Business Address: 928 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Garrison Creek
Toronto ON M6C 1C6
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Address: 340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Business Address: 790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Main Pavillion 13-314
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital, UHN
Gastroenterology
13MP
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5949
Fax: 416-603-5326
Address: 700-790 Bay St
Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 601-340 College Street
Kensington Screening Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-9511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Immune and Digestive Health Institute (TIDHI)
East Tower Entrance, Suite 360
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B4
Phone: (647) 812-2113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 04 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Aug 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 05 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JEYALINGAM JACKSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Jeyalingam (CPSO#: 100402 ) Dr. R. Jackson (CPSO#: 115521 )
Business Address: 928 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Garrison Creek
Toronto ON M6C 1C6
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Address: 340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Business Address: 790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Main Pavillion 13-314
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THURARSHEN JEYALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEYALINGAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THURARSHEN JEYALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEYALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013