THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 928 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Garrison Creek
Toronto ON M6C 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5888
Fax: 416-603-5059

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JEYALINGAM JACKSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Jeyalingam (CPSO#: 100402 ) Dr. R. Jackson (CPSO#: 115521 )
Business Address: 928 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Garrison Creek
Toronto ON M6C 1C6
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Address: 340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Business Address: 790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Main Pavillion 13-314
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 928 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Garrison Creek
Toronto ON M6C 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5888
Fax: 416-603-5059

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JEYALINGAM JACKSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Jeyalingam (CPSO#: 100402 ) Dr. R. Jackson (CPSO#: 115521 )
Business Address: 928 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Garrison Creek
Toronto ON M6C 1C6
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Address: 340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Business Address: 790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Main Pavillion 13-314
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA ANNE JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA ANNE JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018