THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 07:44:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Eastern Virginia Medical School, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare
Room H421
50 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 34355
Fax: 905-526-0540
Address: 40 James Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4W6
Phone: 9052978434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 Charlton Avenue East
unit 406
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
Phone: 9055267002
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 34355
Fax: 905-526-0540

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Jul 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Stallwood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dallman (CPSO#: 105575 ) Dr. C. Stallwood (CPSO#: 100834 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Unit 424
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
905-522-1155 Extn: 34355

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Eastern Virginia Medical School, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare
Room H421
50 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 34355
Fax: 905-526-0540
Address: 40 James Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4W6
Phone: 9052978434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 Charlton Avenue East
unit 406
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
Phone: 9055267002
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 34355
Fax: 905-526-0540

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Jul 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Stallwood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dallman (CPSO#: 105575 ) Dr. C. Stallwood (CPSO#: 100834 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Unit 424
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
905-522-1155 Extn: 34355

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Nov 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 10 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CHRISTOPHER GEORGE STALLWOOD may practise medicine independently in gastroenterology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CHRISTOPHER GEORGE STALLWOOD may practise medicine independently in gastroenterology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Eastern Virginia Medical School, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Nov 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013