THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:08:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Eastern Virginia Medical School, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 363 Colborne St
Grand River Community Health Centre
Brantford ON N3S 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Mar 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Stallwood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dallman (CPSO#: 105575 ) Dr. C. Stallwood (CPSO#: 100834 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Unit 424
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
905-522-1155 Extn: 34355

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Eastern Virginia Medical School, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 363 Colborne St
Grand River Community Health Centre
Brantford ON N3S 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Mar 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Stallwood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dallman (CPSO#: 105575 ) Dr. C. Stallwood (CPSO#: 100834 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Unit 424
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
905-522-1155 Extn: 34355

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Jul 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 29 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rebecca Deon Dallman may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rebecca Deon Dallman may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Eastern Virginia Medical School, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2015