THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:23:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HepCare Cambridge
201-745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 0B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 740-8400
Fax: (519) 740-8440
Address: HepCare Cambridge
201-745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 0B6
Phone: 5197408400
Fax: 5197408440

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadia Quidwai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Quidwai (CPSO#: 101830 ) Dr. M. Sarfaraz (CPSO#: 100849 )
Business Address: 190 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(289) 837-0222
Business Address: 400-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HepCare Cambridge
201-745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 0B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 740-8400
Fax: (519) 740-8440
Address: HepCare Cambridge
201-745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 0B6
Phone: 5197408400
Fax: 5197408440

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadia Quidwai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Quidwai (CPSO#: 101830 ) Dr. M. Sarfaraz (CPSO#: 100849 )
Business Address: 190 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(289) 837-0222
Business Address: 400-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD OMAIR SARFARAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARFARAZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD OMAIR SARFARAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARFARAZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013