THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 02:35:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Road
#400
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 2898370222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Jul 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadia Quidwai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Quidwai (CPSO#: 101830 ) Dr. M. Sarfaraz (CPSO#: 100849 )
Business Address: 190 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(289) 837-0222
Business Address: 400-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Road
#400
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 2898370222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Jul 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadia Quidwai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Quidwai (CPSO#: 101830 ) Dr. M. Sarfaraz (CPSO#: 100849 )
Business Address: 190 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(289) 837-0222
Business Address: 400-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA QUIDWAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIDWAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA QUIDWAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIDWAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2013