THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:04:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 263 McCaul St
4th Floor
Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto Ontario M5T 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 978 6801
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bilbily (CPSO#: 101019 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Address: 3007-825 Church St
Toronto ON M4W 3Z4

Corporation Name: Nicole Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bilbily (CPSO#: 75491 ) Dr. A. Bilbily (CPSO#: 101019 )

Corporation Name: Alexander Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 263 McCaul St
4th Floor
Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto Ontario M5T 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 978 6801
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bilbily (CPSO#: 101019 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Address: 3007-825 Church St
Toronto ON M4W 3Z4

Corporation Name: Nicole Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bilbily (CPSO#: 75491 ) Dr. A. Bilbily (CPSO#: 101019 )

Corporation Name: Alexander Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER HUSAM JANAN BILBILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILBILY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER HUSAM JANAN BILBILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILBILY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013