THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Rossland Rd W
Rossland medical centre, unit #15
Ajax ON L1Z 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 426-9880
Fax: (905)4263196
Address: 1801 Lawrence Avenue East
clinic
8
Toronto Ontario M1R 2X9
Phone: 4168185185
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bilbily (CPSO#: 75491 ) Dr. A. Bilbily (CPSO#: 101019 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Rossland Rd W
Rossland medical centre, unit #15
Ajax ON L1Z 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 426-9880
Fax: (905)4263196
Address: 1801 Lawrence Avenue East
clinic
8
Toronto Ontario M1R 2X9
Phone: 4168185185
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bilbily (CPSO#: 75491 ) Dr. A. Bilbily (CPSO#: 101019 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE BILBILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILBILY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE BILBILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILBILY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2000