THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 56 Westmore Dr
Suite 103
Etobicoke ON M9V 3Z7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167485656
Fax: 4162363940
Address: William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416 747 3400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Queensway East
Unit 19
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 0G4
Phone: 905-804-1919
Fax: 905-997-3779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tsoukas (CPSO#: 120457 ) Dr. A. O'Connor (CPSO#: 101149 )
Business Address: 103-56 Westmore Dr
Etobicoke ON M9V 3Z7
4167485656

Corporation Name: O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Jul 2021

Corporation Name: Nadalini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 56 Westmore Dr
Suite 103
Etobicoke ON M9V 3Z7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167485656
Fax: 4162363940
Address: William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416 747 3400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Queensway East
Unit 19
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 0G4
Phone: 905-804-1919
Fax: 905-997-3779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tsoukas (CPSO#: 120457 ) Dr. A. O'Connor (CPSO#: 101149 )
Business Address: 103-56 Westmore Dr
Etobicoke ON M9V 3Z7
4167485656

Corporation Name: O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Jul 2021

Corporation Name: Nadalini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013