THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:12:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peter Gilgan Centre for Research
686 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tsoukas (CPSO#: 120457 ) Dr. A. O'Connor (CPSO#: 101149 )
Business Address: 103-56 Westmore Dr
Etobicoke ON M9V 3Z7
4167485656

Corporation Name: O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peter Gilgan Centre for Research
686 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tsoukas (CPSO#: 120457 ) Dr. A. O'Connor (CPSO#: 101149 )
Business Address: 103-56 Westmore Dr
Etobicoke ON M9V 3Z7
4167485656

Corporation Name: O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ALEXANDER TSOUKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSOUKAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ALEXANDER TSOUKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSOUKAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2020