THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 03:28:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1101 Francis St
Calabogie ON K0J 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0M9
Phone: 6139451111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan St North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avelino De Jesus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Avelino (CPSO#: 101228 ) Dr. A. De Jesus (CPSO#: 104983 )
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: 100 Health Village Lane
Renfrew Ontario K7V 0C3
(613) 432-2222

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1101 Francis St
Calabogie ON K0J 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0M9
Phone: 6139451111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan St North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avelino De Jesus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Avelino (CPSO#: 101228 ) Dr. A. De Jesus (CPSO#: 104983 )
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: 100 Health Village Lane
Renfrew Ontario K7V 0C3
(613) 432-2222

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA MAE JESSICA DE GUZMAN AVELINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVELINO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA MAE JESSICA DE GUZMAN AVELINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVELINO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013